This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/11/2020 at 09:59:43 (UTC).

ROJAS, ALEIDA vs. R & R ORLANDO FOOD CORP

Case Summary

On 11/09/2017 ROJAS, ALEIDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against R R ORLANDO FOOD CORP. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1803

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROJAS, ALEIDA

Defendant

R & R ORLANDO FOOD CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROWARS, RONALD M

Defendant Attorneys

GUTIERREZ, ALEJANDRO

WACZEWSKI, FREDERIC EZEQUIEL

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

4/18/2019: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

STIPULATION ( V )

1/17/2019: STIPULATION ( V )

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA ( V )

12/19/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

12/13/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE O/INTENT T/SERVE SUBPOENA ( V )

12/7/2018: NOTICE O/INTENT T/SERVE SUBPOENA ( V )

REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

12/5/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )

10/30/2018: PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT ( V )

9/14/2018: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT ( V )

RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

9/14/2018: RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

6/18/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

3/29/2018: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/28/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/2/2018: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

12/19/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

11/22/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

11/21/2017: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

11/9/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney ALEJANDRO GUTIERREZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney RONALD M ROWARS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney FREDERIC EZEQUIEL WACZEWSKI - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4259.1242 / 4557364) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000082239; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ROWARS, RONALD M - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CA001803, ROJAS, ALEIDA VS. R & R ORLANDO FOOD CORP - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-11/9/2017"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE CROOM, JANET C: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ROWARS, RONALD M ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/09/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CA001803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017000082239 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 63991311 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20171109235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREDERIC WACZEWSKI