This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/26/2023 at 07:00:39 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, OFELIA vs. HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 RODRIGUEZ, OFELIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARONICKI, BRETT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARONICKI, BRETT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, OFELIA

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN, THOMAS JEREMIAH JR.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/4/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

1/4/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1/4/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/4/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

1/4/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

1/13/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

2/2/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO DISMISS

2/8/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/22/2023: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

2/27/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AN/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

2/28/2023: ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AN/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

3/20/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AN/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE WARONICKI, BRETT M: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MORGAN, THOMAS JEREMIAH JR. - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023CA000020, RODRIGUEZ, OFELIA VS. HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/5/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MORGAN, THOMAS JEREMIAH JR. ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/04/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA000020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less