Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/07/2021 at 10:53:47 (UTC).

RICHTER, FAITH vs. LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2020 RICHTER, FAITH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LAWNWOOD MEDICAL CENTER INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1175

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICHTER, FAITH

WHITE, BRANDON LEE

RICHTER, ELIZABETH

Defendants

HCA HOLDINGS INC

HCA INC

LAWNWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC

WATT, JASON A

LAWNWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER HEART INSTITUTE

HCA EMCARE HOLDINGS INC

INTENSICE CARE CONSORTIUM INC

VASSELL, KAREN L

RADIOLOGY PHYSICIAN SOLUTIONS OF FLORIDA LLC

ALL STAR RECRUITING INC

KENNEDY RN, DAHLIA DESREEN

CIULLA RN, AMANDA HELENE

DE MARCO MD, ROBERT JR

ENVISION PHYSICIAN SERVICES LLC

SHERIDAN HEALTHCARE INC

ROBINSON ARNP, JAMES T

FLORIDA UNITED RADIOLOGY L C

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BAKER-BARNES, ROSALYN SIA

O'CONNOR, KEVIN PATRICK

ALVAREZ, JAIME JR.

CHIMPOULIS, JAY PAUL

HARBER, STEPHEN NICHOLAS

CORREA, KRISTINA

PRIETO, EDWARD CARLOS

Other Attorneys

FROMANG, STEPHEN DOUGLAS

VANNATTA, KEVIN MONROE

PUYA, KEITH JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/1/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/11/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

11/13/2020: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

11/30/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

11/5/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

10/26/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

OTHER ( V )

9/25/2020: OTHER ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/13/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/11/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/11/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/11/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/25/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/11/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE LANGUAGE IN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
303 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000057426; Applied Amount; $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020000057426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketOTHER CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001175

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HCA-Emcare Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HCA Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sheridan Healthcare of Connecticut, P.C., a subsidiary of Envision Physician Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Radiology Physician Solutions of Florida LLC is a litigant