This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/03/2022 at 10:40:10 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC vs. SHAYDIK, ROBERT J

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHAYDIK, ROBERT J. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are METZGER, ELIZABETH A and BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1715

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC

Defendants

SHAYDIK, ROBERT J

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT J SHAYDIK

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

TIME INVESTMENT COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STARSOLER, TRACY

STARASOLER, TRACY

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

2/18/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

2/3/2022: NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

1/12/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

1/12/2022: AFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

1/12/2022: NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

12/15/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

12/15/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

12/15/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

12/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4696.1963 / 4932857) ( V )

10/4/2021: LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4696.1963 / 4932857) ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/4/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

CASE PLAN

10/1/2021: CASE PLAN

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/1/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/1/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/1/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/1/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/1/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

10/1/2021: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: STARASOLER, TRACY - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001715, REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC VS. SHAYDIK, ROBERT J - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NA-2/3/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001715

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIME INVESTMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Starasoler, Tracy, ESQ.