This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/03/2021 at 14:39:41 (UTC).

REDDING, CRAIG vs. PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 REDDING, CRAIG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1410

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REDDING, JANINIE

REDDING, CRAIG

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANCOLIN, ANA C

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

2/23/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

2/23/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

2/23/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/9/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

1/8/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - 2ND MOTION ( V )

12/9/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - 2ND MOTION ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/16/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

11/16/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

11/9/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

10/22/2020: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/8/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/8/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/21/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/21/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/21/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - 2ND MOTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: FRANCOLIN, ANA C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001410

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065775 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113666308 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francolin, Ana C