Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/27/2021 at 06:01:59 (UTC).

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC vs. HARTLEY, GEORGE B

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HARTLEY, GEORGE B. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0156

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

BENNINGTON VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

STOCKTON VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

TOWNPARK MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

HARTLEY, GEORGE B

FIELDSTONE VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

HARTLEY, PATRICIA C

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'KEEFFE, LORETTA COMISKEY

Defendant Attorneys

LEVINE, SCOTT JASON

MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY

STEELE, W TRENT

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

3/8/2021: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

2/18/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/11/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

2/8/2021: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

2/5/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR 4547 PG 1533) ( V )

2/2/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR 4547 PG 1533) ( V )

ANSWER - BENNINGTON VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC ( V )

2/1/2021: ANSWER - BENNINGTON VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC ( V )

ANSWER - TOWNPARK MASTER ASSOCIATION INC ( V )

2/1/2021: ANSWER - TOWNPARK MASTER ASSOCIATION INC ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

1/28/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/26/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/26/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/26/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/26/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

1/26/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

1/26/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

1/26/2021: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/26/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/26/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS EXTRA NAMES ASSESSED $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/26/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000156

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIELDSTONE VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BENNINGTON VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TOWNPARK MASTER ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where STOCKTON VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant