This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 12:12:18 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY vs. THE TERMINEX INTERNATIONAL CO. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against THE TERMINEX INTERNATIONAL CO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0577

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

THE TERMINEX INTERNATIONAL CO. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORNFIELD, GARY CARL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

2/23/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

2/23/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

3/7/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

3/13/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: KORNFIELD, GARY CARL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023CC000577, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS. THE TERMINEX INTERNATIONAL CO. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/23/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: KORNFIELD, GARY CARL ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/23/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CC000577

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2023000015212 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 167424169 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230223235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less