This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 09/27/2020 at 14:29:32 (UTC).

PREBLE, CAROL vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 PREBLE, CAROL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0293

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREBLE, CAROL

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNNAVANT, ERIN

Defendant Attorney

THAXTON, ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4460.2074 / 4741382)

8/12/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4460.2074 / 4741382)

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

8/12/2020: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

8/12/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

4/6/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

4/6/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4/6/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION TO STRIKE

3/20/2020: MOTION TO STRIKE

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

3/12/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/4/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/21/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/17/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/17/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/17/2020: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/17/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/17/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/17/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketAttorney ERIN DUNNAVANT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketAttorney ROBERT J THAXTON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4460.2074 / 4741382)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DUNNAVANT, ERIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/17/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000293

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000015391 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 103405484 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200217235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less