This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/27/2021 at 12:18:34 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs. NARCISSE, MARIE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NARCISSE, MARIE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2328

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

NARCISSE, MARIE

Fort Pierce, FL 34947

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

Defendant Attorney

DESMOND, LEO WASSNER

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

12/8/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REHEARING OR CORRECT

12/22/2020: ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REHEARING OR CORRECT

NOTICE CONF INFO

7/27/2020: NOTICE CONF INFO

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/19/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MEMORANDUM

1/19/2021: MEMORANDUM

ORDER WAIVING IN-PERSON APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, REQUIRING EMAIL DESIGNATION AND REQUIRING REMOTE APPEARANCE

10/9/2020: ORDER WAIVING IN-PERSON APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, REQUIRING EMAIL DESIGNATION AND REQUIRING REMOTE APPEARANCE

COURT MINUTES

9/16/2020: COURT MINUTES

COURT MINUTES

12/9/2020: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/8/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO STAYING TRIAL PENDING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING WITNESS LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REHEARING OR CORRECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: FAGEN, JESSICA JO ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: FISHMAN, BARRY ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/28/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020SC002328

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2020000052550 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 110869470 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200728235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less