This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:21:19 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. CARUSO, PAULINE

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARUSO, PAULINE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1428

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

CARUSO, PAULINE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (V)

7/26/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (V)

CIVIL COVER SHEET (V)

7/26/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET (V)

COMPLAINT (V )

7/26/2017: COMPLAINT (V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

7/27/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/1/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

9/14/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

ORDER TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ( V )

10/23/2017: ORDER TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ( V )

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V )

11/22/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

12/21/2017: COURT MINUTES ( V )

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE( V )

12/21/2017: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE( V )

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4078.2998 / 4383748) ( V )

12/22/2017: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4078.2998 / 4383748) ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

1/30/2018: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4092.1748 / 4396667) ( V )

2/1/2018: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4092.1748 / 4396667) ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney RACQUEL ANN WHITE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4092.1748 / 4396667) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4078.2998 / 4383748) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • HearingEvent: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET FOR 12/21/2017 AT 9:30 AM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: WHITE, RACQUEL ANN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017SC001428, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. CARUSO, PAULINE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-7/27/2017"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/11/2017 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WHITE, RACQUEL ANN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/27/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017SC001428

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017000057185 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 59570323 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170727235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET (V)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (V)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant