This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/05/2021 at 04:25:04 (UTC).

PONTE, EDUARDO vs. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 PONTE, EDUARDO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1546

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PONTE, EDUARDO

Defendants

ROMERO, MARIA

ESQUIBEL, RODRIGO

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

AGUILAR, CLAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYD, JAMES CURTIS

Defendant Attorneys

TADROS, DAVID SPYROS

WANNOS, ISAAC JAMES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/16/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/11/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

1/11/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/29/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

12/29/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/25/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

11/19/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

11/10/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE ( V )

11/10/2020: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

11/10/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/13/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000013036; Applied Amount; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: BOYD, JAMES CURTIS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001546, PONTE, EDUARDO VS. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/17/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021000013036 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 121491938 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210217235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BOYD, JAMES CURTIS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2020000072905 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 114898179 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201014235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001546

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYD, JAMES CURTIS