Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 22:37:08 (UTC).

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. CULVERHOUSE, JOHN B JR

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CULVERHOUSE, JOHN B JR. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0230

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CITY OF FORT PIERCE

UNKOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN B CULVERHOUSE JR

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

HARBOR FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN B CULVERHOUSE

CULVERHOUSE, JOHN B

CULVERHOUSE, JOHN B JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ, ALLEN STEWART

ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y

Defendant Attorneys

MOSLEY, IOLA T

MASEL, GARY IAN

SACKLER, CRAIG ALAN

VOCELLE, LOUIS B JR.

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

9/9/2019: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

5/29/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

5/29/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

4/3/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

4/2/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

3/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

3/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/4/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

11/18/2019: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT ( V )

9/20/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT ( V )

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

8/16/2019: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

7/31/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

5/29/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

2/4/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/4/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/4/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/4/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/18/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/18/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS EXTRA NAMES ASSESSED $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/04/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000230

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMF 250,000 OR MORE ASSESSED $1905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARBOR FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF FORT PIERCE is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ullman, Zachary Y.