This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/24/2020 at 16:56:22 (UTC).

PFEIFFER, KEVIN W vs. WAL-MART STORES INC

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 PFEIFFER, KEVIN W filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0021

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PFEIFFER, KEVIN W

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAVERMAN, DANIEL LIPMAN

Defendant Attorneys

WOODS, CARY CONERWAY II

VICTOR, GREGORY ALAN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

7/8/2019: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

3/21/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

3/21/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

3/21/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

3/21/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/21/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/1/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/3/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/3/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

8/14/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED ( V )

7/19/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

3/28/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

3/22/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

3/21/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

3/5/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/31/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/22/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/22/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION /RE-NTC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL SET FOR 12/04/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN 3D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HAVERMAN, DANIEL LIPMAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000021, PFEIFFER, KEVIN W VS. WAL-MART STORES INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/4/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000001485 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 82824747 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190104235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/03/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant