This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/27/2020 at 01:11:47 (UTC).

PEREZ, JOSE vs. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 PEREZ, JOSE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0261

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ, JOSE

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIKGREN, BRENT SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

JULMISTE, WILNAR JEANNE

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4276.2513 / 4575167) ( V )

6/3/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4276.2513 / 4575167) ( V )

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

5/29/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

5/23/2019: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

REPLY ( V )

3/1/2019: REPLY ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

2/28/2019: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

2/28/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/28/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

2/11/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/8/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/7/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/7/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/7/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/7/2019: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/7/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/7/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/7/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney BRENT SCOTT WIKGREN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney WILNAR JEANNE JULMISTE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4276.2513 / 4575167) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WIKGREN, BRENT SCOTT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000011810 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 84602695 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190208235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/07/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000261

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wikgren, Brent