This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/01/2021 at 16:37:13 (UTC).

PEPITONE, DAVID vs. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 PEPITONE, DAVID filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CROOM, JANET C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2591

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CROOM, JANET C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEPITONE, DENISE

PEPITONE, DAVID

Defendants

WAL-MART STORES INC

WOODS, ANGELA

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAKALAR, GEORGE MICHAEL

SCHMITT, THOMAS PAUL

PACHTER, SETH

Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON, GREGORY THOMAS

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1/14/2016: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

12/18/2015: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

12/11/2015: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/4/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

5/13/2015: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

STIPULATED SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

3/24/2015: STIPULATED SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

2/25/2015: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

PRIVILEGE LOG

10/10/2014: PRIVILEGE LOG

REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/8/2013: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION

1/13/2016: NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION

MOTION

11/24/2015: MOTION

ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

9/15/2015: ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

7/15/2015: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

NOTICE - OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

5/7/2015: NOTICE - OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/13/2014: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/10/2014: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS (5 & 20 DAY)

8/15/2014: SUMMONS (5 & 20 DAY)

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

10/11/2013: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

198 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney GEORGE MICHAEL BAKALAR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney GEORGE MICHAEL BAKALAR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney GREGORY THOMAS ANDERSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (OR.3849.2708 / 4172866) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3827.394 / 4150132)

    Read MoreRead Less
205 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321123467; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF PROP INTEROGS:PUBLIX SUPERMARKETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:PUBLIX SUPERMARKETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACHTER ESQ, SETH W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHMITT, THOMAS P