This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/12/2023 at 15:24:00 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC vs. DAVIS, JACKY

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against DAVIS, JACKY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1507

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

DAVIS, JACKY

DAVIS, MATTIE F

ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

1 PATEL, PRATIK R 3 FORCE, STEVEN L 2 LEWIS, COREY MICHAEL 4 MAISONET, LINDSAY BROOKE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/18/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/18/2022: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

8/18/2022: LIS PENDENS

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

8/18/2022: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/18/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/18/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/18/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/18/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

8/18/2022: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT

8/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED - ADAMS HOMES

8/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - ADAMS HOMES

SUMMONS ISSUED - MATTIE F DAVIS

8/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - MATTIE F DAVIS

SUMMONS ISSUED - JACKY DAVIS

8/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - JACKY DAVIS

LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.4876.981. / 5086365)

8/19/2022: LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.4876.981. / 5086365)

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

10/6/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

12/2/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER.4876.981. / 5086365)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

Docket"RECIPIENTS: LEWIS, COREY MICHAEL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CA001507, PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC VS. DAVIS, JACKY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 4 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/19/2022"

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JACKY DAVIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MATTIE F DAVIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ADAMS HOMES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketPAYMENT $954.00 RECEIPT #2022000064796 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 155662914 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220819235959.TXT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PATEL, PRATIK R ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
08/18/2022

DocketNOTICE OF FILING - NOTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketCASE FILED 08/18/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001507

[+] Read More [-] Read Less