This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 23:08:20 (UTC).

PADULA, NIURKA vs. PADULA, MARK A.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 PADULA, NIURKA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PADULA, MARK A. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1653

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PADULA, NIURKA

Respondent

PADULA, MARK A.

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTES

8/15/2022: COURT NOTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2022
  • DocketAttorney THEODORE CHARLES SHAFER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • DocketAttorney BONNIE ANDERSON CONRAD - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING; Judge: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L; Location: Courtroom 4A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, REPEAT VIOLENCE, DATING VIOLENCE, OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE - RECORDED (OTHER.4881.2665. / 5091180)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES; ANDERSON CONRAD, BONNIE; PADULA, NIURKA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR001653, PADULA, NIURKA VS. PADULA, MARK A. - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFORDDTEMINJ-8/31/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, REPEAT VIOLENCE, DATING VIOLENCE, OR SEXUAL VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR001653, PADULA, NIURKA VS. PADULA, MARK A. - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: VOLDISWOP-8/30/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSTEPS IN OBTAINING AN INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/30/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR001653

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less