********0796
03/06/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Not Classified By Court
St. Lucie, Florida
ALONZO, EDMOND W
OLIPHANT FINANCIAL, LLC
MORALES, MICHELLE
2 RAHNAVARD, ALI ROBERT 2 SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT
3/4/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
3/4/2023: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
3/4/2023: COMPLAINT
3/4/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
3/7/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED
3/29/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED
HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC
[-] Read LessDocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED
[-] Read LessDocket"RECIPIENTS: SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023SC000796, OLIPHANT FINANCIAL, LLC VS. MORALES, MICHELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-3/7/2023"
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED
[-] Read LessDocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/03/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W
[-] Read LessDocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: RAHNAVARD, ALI ROBERT ASSIGNED
[-] Read LessDocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000019288 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 168042306 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230307235959.TXT.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE FILED 03/06/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023SC000796
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT
[-] Read LessDocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET
[-] Read Less