This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/27/2023 at 07:05:24 (UTC).

OLIPHANT FINANCIAL, LLC vs. MORALES, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 OLIPHANT FINANCIAL, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORALES, MICHELLE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0796

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIPHANT FINANCIAL, LLC

Defendant

MORALES, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

2 RAHNAVARD, ALI ROBERT 2 SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/4/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

3/4/2023: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

3/4/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

3/4/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/7/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

3/29/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023SC000796, OLIPHANT FINANCIAL, LLC VS. MORALES, MICHELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-3/7/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/03/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: RAHNAVARD, ALI ROBERT ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000019288 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 168042306 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230307235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/06/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023SC000796

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less