This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/02/2021 at 06:47:21 (UTC).

OLCHA, GARY vs. IDEAL CARPET & UPHOLSTERY CARE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2012 OLCHA, GARY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IDEAL CARPET UPHOLSTERY CARE, INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEIGER, DWIGHT L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2874

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEIGER, DWIGHT L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLCHA, GARY

OLCHA, ANN

Defendants

SELINGER, MARK

IDEAL CARPET & UPHOLSTERY CARE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFERSON, BRADFORD L

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.3602.1863 / 3923460)

11/20/2013: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.3602.1863 / 3923460)

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

7/9/2013: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

6/26/2013: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

REQUEST FOR COPIES

2/7/2013: REQUEST FOR COPIES

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

11/29/2012: RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY

11/2/2012: NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY

NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

10/15/2012: NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

9/10/2012: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/19/2012: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MEDIATION REPORT

9/23/2013: MEDIATION REPORT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/15/2013: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CLERK'S NOTES

2/22/2013: CLERK'S NOTES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

11/26/2012: REQUEST FOR COPIES

ORDER ON MTN TO COMPEL

11/9/2012: ORDER ON MTN TO COMPEL

ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES:TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/18/2012: ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES:TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED

8/15/2012: SUMMONS RETURNED

NTC OF TAKING DEPO:MARK SELINGER NOV 8, 2012 @ 10:00 AM

7/19/2012: NTC OF TAKING DEPO:MARK SELINGER NOV 8, 2012 @ 10:00 AM

NTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::MARK SELINGER

7/19/2012: NTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::MARK SELINGER

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney BRADFORD L JEFFERSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.3602.1863 / 3923460)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GEIGER, DWIGHT L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321124217; Applied Amount; $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::IDEAL CARPET & UPHOLSTERY CARE INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF TAKING DEPO:MARK SELINGER NOV 8, 2012 @ 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::MARK SELINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFERSON, BRADFORD L