This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 11/17/2021 at 10:47:19 (UTC).

OCAMPO, JHONATHAN vs. GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 OCAMPO, JHONATHAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1459

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCAMPO, JHONATHAN

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CREMEENS, JEANNE MICHELLE

CREMEENS, PATRICK J

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL, CHARLES PENDLETON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/17/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/17/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

8/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/1/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

10/6/2021: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/27/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

10/27/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/27/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000064760; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CREMEENS, JEANNE MICHELLE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001459, OCAMPO, JHONATHAN VS. GENERAL MOTORS LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/17/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CREMEENS, PATRICK J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001459

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021000064760 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 132810127 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210817235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL, CHARLES PENDLETON