This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/24/2020 at 07:23:25 (UTC).

NORTHWEST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. FERNANDEZ, DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 NORTHWEST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FERNANDEZ, DANIELLE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1651

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWEST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

FERNANDEZ, DANIELLE

FERNANDEZ, MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH, JEFFREY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

1/21/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO MIGUEL FERNANDEZ ( V )

1/3/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO MIGUEL FERNANDEZ ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

12/4/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

10/29/2019: DEFAULT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

10/25/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

8/21/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ( V )

2/18/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ( V )

AFFIDAVIT ( V )

12/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE ( V )

12/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE ( V )

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

12/23/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/10/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

12/9/2019: ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

10/25/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/23/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/21/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AS TO MIGUEL FERNANDEZ ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4366.1206 / 4659092) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AS TO MIGUEL FERNANDEZ ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000102519; Applied Amount; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MOUCH, JEFFREY JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001651, NORTHWEST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS. FERNANDEZ, DANIELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/21/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOUCH, JEFFREY JOSEPH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/21/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001651

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019000069664 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 94504526 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190821235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less