This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:20:35 (UTC).

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY vs. A MENDEZ CONSTRUCTION LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A MENDEZ CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1401

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

A MENDEZ CONSTRUCTION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BATTA, RAVI

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/2/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000065391; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001401, NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY VS. A. MENDEZ CONSTRUCTION LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/18/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BATTA, RAVI ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065391 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113597016 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200918235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less