This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/13/2023 at 09:23:47 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC vs. SPARNICHT, KATHERINE

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SPARNICHT, KATHERINE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

Defendants

SPARNICHT, KATHERINE

MV REALTY PBC, LLC

ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, ETC CHARLES F SPARNICHT, DEC

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

ALL PARTIES CLAIMING TO HAVE RIGHT, TITLE, ETC IN THE PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

1 DUGGAR, JASON 2 BERGER, CHASE ADAM

Defendant Attorney

HOUSTON, KATHY L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/28/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/17/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

2/17/2023: RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF ACTION

2/17/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION

INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK

2/17/2023: INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

2/17/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/14/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

2/10/2023: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

AFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

2/10/2023: AFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM

2/9/2023: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

2/9/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

2/9/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

2/9/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/9/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/9/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/9/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

2/2/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 03/21/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 03/21/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DUGGAR, JASON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023CA000022, NEWREZ LLC VS. SPARNICHT, KATHERINE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: RETP-2/17/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/04/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA000022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less