Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 11/06/2020 at 10:55:38 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC vs. FERNDANDEZ, ELIZABETH C

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FERNDANDEZ, ELIZABETH C. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2251

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTHONY SAL BAEZ

BAEZ, ANTHONY SAL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JARED CHRISTIAN BAEZ

BAEZ, MICHAEL HERBERT

BAEZ, JACOB CHRISTOPHER

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

BAEZ, ETHAN DANIEL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL HERBERT BAEZ

BANK OF AMERICA N A

FERNDANDEZ, ELIZABETH C

BAEZ, JARED CHRISTIAN

UNKNOWN PARTIED IN POSSESSION #1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ETHAN DANIEL BAEZ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACOB CHRISTOPHER BAEZ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIZABETH C FERNDANDEZ A/K/A ELIZABETH C BAEZ A/K/A ELIZABETH BAEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DISKIN, LARA NICOLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

1/29/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4349.504 / 4644584) ( V )

11/21/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4349.504 / 4644584) ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

11/20/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

11/19/2019: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

11/19/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

11/19/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

11/19/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAttorney LARA NICOLE DISKIN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000010180; Applied Amount; $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4377.1334 / 4669457) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $27.00 RECEIPT #2020000010180 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 102417986 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200131235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - ELIZABETH BAEZ ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000097240; Applied Amount; $1,096.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,096.00 RECEIPT #2019000097240

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DISKIN, LARA NICOLE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/19/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002251

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diskin, Lara, ESQ.