This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/28/2020 at 14:33:00 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. WESTBERRY, ALTON LUTHER EST

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WESTBERRY, ALTON LUTHER EST. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0585

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

WESTBERRY, JAMES

UNK PARTY 3

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNK PARTY 2

WESTBERRY, ALTON LUTHER EST

WESTBERRY, JOSEPH

WESTBERRY CASTILLO, APRIL DAWN

ST LUCIE GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNK PARTY 4

UNK PARTY 1

24/7 SUPERIOR CLEANING AND RESTORATION LLC

ST LUCIE COUNTY CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT

Not Yet Classified

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAMS, KERRY

SWOSINSKI, JUSTIN ALLEN

BRONFELD, ERIC LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorneys

KLETZKIN, STEVEN C

HARLOWE, SCOTT ROBERT

WALKER, TRAVIS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE SALE SHEET ( V )

12/4/2019: FORECLOSURE SALE SHEET ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ( V )

10/7/2019: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ( V )

NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

5/1/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

4/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

4/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

3/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

3/21/2019: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

3/21/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

3/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

12/4/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/31/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )

8/8/2019: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

8/8/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

7/26/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

7/3/2019: DEFAULT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

7/3/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

5/1/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

3/21/2019: LIS PENDENS ( V )

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney ERIC LAWRENCE BRONFELD - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4359.779 / 4653354) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000101650; Applied Amount; $1,320.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $1320.20 RECEIPT #2019000101650 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 99843436 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191206235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ADAMS, KERRY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/22/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $1034.50 RECEIPT #2019000025341 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 86789920 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190322235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST LUCIE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLETZKIN, STEVEN C