Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/26/2020 at 06:01:08 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. UNK SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNK SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0281

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

UNK SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

INDIAN RIVER ESTATES ASSOCIATION INC

WRIGHT, CAMILLE DARLENE

ST LUCIE COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

UNK TENANT #1

UNK SP OF CAMILLE DARLENE WRIGHT

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

UNK TENANT #2

Not Yet Classified

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A CHAMPION MORTAGE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIN-DUNCAN, KARISSA

Defendant Attorney

HARLOWE, SCOTT ROBERT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE ( V )

11/19/2019: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

6/28/2019: DEFAULT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

3/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

3/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/11/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/11/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/11/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

2/11/2019: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

11/19/2019: CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD ( V )

9/16/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

6/28/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

ANSWER ( V )-CLERK OF COURT

4/15/2019: ANSWER ( V )-CLERK OF COURT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

3/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

3/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

3/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/11/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/11/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GREENSPOON MARDER; TRAVIS WALKER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000281, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS. UNK SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CND-1/21/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GREENSPOON MARDER; TRAVIS WALKER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000281, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS. UNK SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CEOT-1/24/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4374.679 / 4666510) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000003415; Applied Amount; $858.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $858.90 RECEIPT #2020000003415 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 101416992 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200110235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: stlucie.clerkauction.com; Result: SOLD TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000281, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS. UNK SPOUSE, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: COS-1/8/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS EXTRA NAMES ASSESSED $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURES ASSESSED $130.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/11/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000281

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST LUCIE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where INDIAN RIVER ESTATES ASSON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant