This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/26/2020 at 01:57:23 (UTC).

MORRA, DEAN vs. USR HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 MORRA, DEAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USR HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0260

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORRA, DEAN

Defendants

GREEN, KWANYEH

AMETHYST RECOVERY CENTER LLC

USR HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELSNER, ANDREW BERNARD MR

Defendant Attorneys

HOWANITZ, ELIZABETH HOLLAND

KOUTNIK, CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

6/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

5/17/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

4/19/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

4/18/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

4/11/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

4/8/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT ( V )

2/22/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT ( V )

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

2/22/2019: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/7/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/15/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

8/11/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

4/30/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/11/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

2/12/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

COMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

12/30/2019: COMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

ORDER ON MOTION DENIED IN PART COUNTS I AND II AND GRANTING COUNT IV ( V )

12/18/2019: ORDER ON MOTION DENIED IN PART COUNTS I AND II AND GRANTING COUNT IV ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS - AMENDED ( V )

12/11/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS - AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketORDER SUSTAINING OBJECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 06/25/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN 3D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ELSNER, ANDREW BERNARD MR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/07/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019000011377 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 84592380 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190207235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELSNER, ANDREW BERNARD MR