This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/02/2021 at 04:48:55 (UTC).

MORGAN, RAYMOND vs. GABRIEL, SAMUEL

Case Summary

On 07/17/2012 MORGAN, RAYMOND filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GABRIEL, SAMUEL. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CROOM, JANET C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2852

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CROOM, JANET C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORGAN, RAYMOND

KERMAN-MORGAN, ALISA

Defendants

GABRIEL, SONYA

GABRIEL, SAMUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACHTER, SETH

Defendant Attorney

VASQUEZ, GARY DIXON

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

2/2/2017: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

SETTLEMENT STATEMENT ( V )

12/1/2016: SETTLEMENT STATEMENT ( V )

PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )

9/8/2016: PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )

COURT NOTES

10/22/2014: COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

7/1/2013: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

4/15/2013: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/24/2012: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

7/17/2012: COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE:SAMUEL GABRIEL

7/17/2012: REQUEST TO PRODUCE:SAMUEL GABRIEL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

3/30/2017: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

7/11/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

8/25/2014: ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/29/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

SUGGESTION OF DEATH

3/14/2014: SUGGESTION OF DEATH

NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY

2/21/2013: NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

2/19/2013: RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

REPLY TO AFFIRM DEFENSES:AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/14/2012: REPLY TO AFFIRM DEFENSES:AND MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/20/2012: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney SETH PACHTER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney GARY DIXON VASQUEZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney GARY DIXON VASQUEZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3979.1945 / 4293178) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3960.224 / 4273800) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STATEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321124159; Applied Amount; $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:SAMUEL GABRIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF PROP INTEROGS:SAMUEL GABRIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACHTER ESQ, SETH W