This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 19:17:57 (UTC).

MOORE, ROBERT vs. REDFIELD-MOORE, RONDA J

Case Summary

On 01/27/2014 MOORE, ROBERT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against REDFIELD-MOORE, RONDA J. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L, DAVID, LEE, EWEN, LILLIAN BOUDRIAS, MCHUGH, ELIZABETH, BAUER, SHERWOOD JR and BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0223

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

DAVID, LEE

EWEN, LILLIAN BOUDRIAS

MCHUGH, ELIZABETH

BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOORE, ROBERT

Respondent

REDFIELD-MOORE, RONDA J

Not Yet Classified

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

1 MORRISS, ALISON K 7 LONG - LOUBRIEL, JADELYNE S 2 LEFFEW, ALISON 3 JOHNSON, KAREN LYNN 4 SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES 5 SOUCY, BRENDEN D 6 METCALFE, GEORGE LAMBETH

Respondent Attorney

1 POPA, JAMES W 2 FERRARO, RUSSELL J III 3 WALKER, TRAVIS RICHARD 4 SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN

 

Court Documents

STANDING TEMP DOMESTIC REL ODR/EMAILED ATTY 1/27/14

1/27/2014: STANDING TEMP DOMESTIC REL ODR/EMAILED ATTY 1/27/14

MOTION (NON DOR)/ FOR PARENTING PLAN MODIFICATION/EMAILED ULA 4/6/16 ( V )

4/5/2016: MOTION (NON DOR)/ FOR PARENTING PLAN MODIFICATION/EMAILED ULA 4/6/16 ( V )

ORDER ON MOTION FOR TESTIMONY OF MINOR CHILD(REN)

8/15/2016: ORDER ON MOTION FOR TESTIMONY OF MINOR CHILD(REN)

COURT NOTES

6/26/2017: COURT NOTES

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ( V )

12/4/2018: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM ( V )

12/15/2016: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM ( V )

ORDER ADJUDGING HUSBAND TO BE IN INDIRECT CIVIL CONTEMPT/EMAILED SUPPORT 4/6/17 ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3981.2719 / 4295114) ( V )

4/7/2017: ORDER ADJUDGING HUSBAND TO BE IN INDIRECT CIVIL CONTEMPT/EMAILED SUPPORT 4/6/17 ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3981.2719 / 4295114) ( V )

ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL ( V )

6/26/2017: ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL ( V )

ORDER SETTING TRIAL ( V )

12/15/2017: ORDER SETTING TRIAL ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: EWEN, LILLIAN BOUDRIAS; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: EWEN, LILLIAN BOUDRIAS; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
359 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LEFFEW, ALISON ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/27/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014DR000223

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketPAYMENT $418.00 RECEIPT #2014000009636 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 9584979 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20140127235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/0001
  • HearingEvent: NO DESCRIPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant