This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/24/2020 at 04:31:57 (UTC).

MONSAL STREET LLC vs. K, C

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 MONSAL STREET LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against K, C. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1432

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONSAL STREET LLC

Defendant

K, C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLOHN, JAMES A

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTES

10/22/2020: COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING / RE-NTC ( V )

10/21/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING / RE-NTC ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

10/18/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/25/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/25/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT

9/23/2020: PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/23/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: TELEPHONIC HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / RE-NTC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING REVISED EXHBIT D ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketTELEPHONIC HEARING SET FOR 10/21/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: TELEPHONIC HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketTELEPHONIC HEARING SET FOR 10/16/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000066745; Applied Amount; $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020000066745 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113870968 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200924235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: KLOHN, JAMES A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less