This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 15:17:33 (UTC).

MILLER, PATRICK vs. MYERS, DOLORES J

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 MILLER, PATRICK filed an Other lawsuit against MYERS, DOLORES J. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1493

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MILLER, PATRICK

Respondents

MYERS, DOLORES J

MILLER, DUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketRETURN MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketORDER TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR001493, MILLER, PATRICK VS. MYERS, DOLORES J - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-6/15/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/15/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR001493

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000046204 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 151532219 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220615235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less