This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 09/26/2022 at 12:07:03 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. FERAN, HECTOR

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FERAN, HECTOR. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2133

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

FERAN, HECTOR

Port Saint Lucie, FL 34983

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILIUIKO, OLEKSANDRA

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS, J NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/28/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

7/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT

8/4/2022: NOTICE OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT

COURT MINUTES

8/10/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

9/14/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

9/14/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4889.2291. / 5098231)

9/15/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4889.2291. / 5098231)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4889.2291. / 5098231)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: CASTELLANOS, J NICHOLAS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: PILIUIKO, OLEKSANDRA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022SC002133, MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS. FERAN, HECTOR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-6/30/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/10/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: OLEKSANDRA PILIUIKO ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022000050444 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 152339143 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220630235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC002133

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS