This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/27/2022 at 04:17:58 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK vs. BURKE, JOHN

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BURKE, JOHN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1186

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFIRST BANK

Defendants

BURKE, JOHN

BURKE, LORI A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN BURKE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LORI A BURKE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CITY OF FORT PIERCE FLORIDA

COLLINS, CARROLL

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, ANNA J

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.4852.2648. / 5064484)

7/7/2022: LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.4852.2648. / 5064484)

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

CASE PLAN

6/29/2022: CASE PLAN

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/29/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/29/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/29/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/29/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/29/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/29/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.4852.2648. / 5064484)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ROSENBERG, ANNA J - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CA001186, MIDFIRST BANK VS. BURKE, JOHN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 10 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-7/1/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001186

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF FORT PIERCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant