Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 06:48:38 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. PAGEL, WILLIAM J

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PAGEL, WILLIAM J. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2339

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY #2

PAGEL, TIMOTHY JOSEPH

ZIMMERMAN, CATHERINE P

PRINCESS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF HUTCHINSON ISLAND INC

PAGEL, CHRISTOPHER C

UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES ETC

UNKNOWN PARTY #1

PAGEL, WILLIAM J

PAGEL, SHAWN MICHAEL

LOWRY, THERESA J

PAGEL, JAMES E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON, BARRY B

ALLEN, ANDREA

Defendant Attorney

DERMODY, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ( V )

11/6/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ( V )

WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

10/25/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

10/21/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4307.431 / 4604354) ( V )

8/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4307.431 / 4604354) ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V )

8/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ( V )

6/27/2019: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

6/19/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

4/18/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

3/6/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/28/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

2/28/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

2/28/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

2/28/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4217.638 / 4514742) ( V )

12/28/2018: LIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4217.638 / 4514742) ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

12/19/2018: LIS PENDENS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/19/2018: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/19/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAttorney ANDREA ALLEN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAttorney MICHAEL DERMODY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAttorney BARRY B JOHNSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ALLEN, ANDREA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $2049.50 RECEIPT #2018000096533 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 82355543 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20181220235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/19/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CA002339

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DERMODY, MICHAEL