Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/12/2021 at 13:46:20 (UTC).

MESSER, KISMET NICOLE vs. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 MESSER, KISMET NICOLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1878

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MESSER, KISMET N

MESSER, KISMET NICOLE

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

TRIAS, LAURENCE

RODRIGUEZ, JACKELINE SOFIA

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

3/18/2021: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

3/18/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

3/18/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

3/18/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

3/1/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/22/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

1/20/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/14/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/8/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/6/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/22/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/22/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/14/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

12/14/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/14/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

12/14/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/14/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000087763 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 118130516 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201214235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trias, Laurence