This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 23:11:33 (UTC).

MELE, MARISSA vs. MELE, COOPER LUKE

Case Summary

On 11/22/2013 MELE, MARISSA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MELE, COOPER LUKE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLDEHOFF, JULIE, MULLINS, LEATHA DAWN, BAUER, SHERWOOD JR, MCHUGH, ELIZABETH, EWEN, LILLIAN BOUDRIAS, SLUSHER, TERRY and BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3252

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLDEHOFF, JULIE

MULLINS, LEATHA DAWN

BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

MCHUGH, ELIZABETH

EWEN, LILLIAN BOUDRIAS

SLUSHER, TERRY

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MELE, MARISSA

Respondent

MELE, COOPER LUKE

Not Yet Classified

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CASTRO, HERNAN

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - Recorded (OR.3616.260 / 3938259)

3/26/2014: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - Recorded (OR.3616.260 / 3938259)

FINAL ORDER UPON RECOMMENDED ORDER ON FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION TO CONTEST DELINQUENCY ACTION FILED 6/11/14 (GRANTED) - Recorded (OR.3696.200 / 4019400)

12/4/2014: FINAL ORDER UPON RECOMMENDED ORDER ON FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION TO CONTEST DELINQUENCY ACTION FILED 6/11/14 (GRANTED) - Recorded (OR.3696.200 / 4019400)

PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

6/27/2017: PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

DIRECT DEPOSIT INFORMATION ( V )

10/9/2018: DIRECT DEPOSIT INFORMATION ( V )

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION ( V )

11/19/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

12/13/2018: ANSWER ( V )

MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

12/13/2018: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION TO PERMIT RELOCATION WITH MINOR CHILDREN ( V )

5/24/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION TO PERMIT RELOCATION WITH MINOR CHILDREN ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

5/31/2019: ANSWER ( V )

RESPONSE TO FATHER'S ANSWER ( V )

6/3/2019: RESPONSE TO FATHER'S ANSWER ( V )

CONTEMPT ORDER ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4279.738 / 4577242) ( V )

6/5/2019: CONTEMPT ORDER ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4279.738 / 4577242) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingEvent: DOR HEARING; Judge: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH; Location: Courtroom 2A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDOR HEARING SET FOR 02/06/2023 AT 9:45 AM IN 2A/ , HEARING OFFICER: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT-IVD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $5.80 RECEIPT #2022000078328

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022000078327

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $76.67 RECEIPT #2022000078325

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPOSTAGE ASSESSED $1.47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
325 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketPETITION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketSUMMCIR WAIVED INDIGENT $10.0000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketDISS MARRIAGE WAIVED INDIGENT $397.5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketDISS JDGMT FEE WAIVED INDIGENT $10.5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ASSESSED $397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketDISSOLUTION JUDGMENT FEE ASSESSED $10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/22/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013DR003252

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNAN CASTRO