This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 09/16/2021 at 03:58:34 (UTC).

MEB LOAN TRUST III US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. DURAN ALTAMIRANO, SERGIO

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 MEB LOAN TRUST III US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DURAN ALTAMIRANO, SERGIO. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1168

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEB LOAN TRUST III US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DURAN ALTAMIRANO, SERGIO

DURAN, DORA E

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

7/23/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

7/23/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING ( V )

7/1/2021: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING ( V )

LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4638.1492 / 4886358) ( V )

6/28/2021: LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4638.1492 / 4886358) ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

6/28/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

6/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

6/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

6/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

6/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ( V )

6/25/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

6/25/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

6/25/2021: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

6/25/2021: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

6/25/2021: LIS PENDENS ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

6/25/2021: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

6/25/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

6/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketAttorney SARA BETH COLLINS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000051377; Applied Amount; $951.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4638.1492 / 4886358) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001168, MEB LOAN TRUST III US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NO VS. DURAN ALTAMIRANO, SERGIO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-6/28/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: COLLINS, SARA BETH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001168

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meb Loan Trust Iii Us Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ