This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 05:15:47 (UTC).

MCDOWELL, ROWMINNER vs. MORING, OCTAVIA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 MCDOWELL, ROWMINNER filed an Other lawsuit against MORING, OCTAVIA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3059

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDOWELL, ROWMINNER

Defendant

MORING, OCTAVIA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/28/2022: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ACKNOWLEDGMENT

11/28/2022: ACKNOWLEDGMENT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS

11/28/2022: UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

12/2/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

ANSWER

12/7/2022: ANSWER

FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1/10/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER

FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RECORDED (OTHER.4936.2321. / 5141442)

1/10/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RECORDED (OTHER.4936.2321. / 5141442)

WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

1/18/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/18/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

1/23/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

EMERGENCY MOTION

1/23/2023: EMERGENCY MOTION

ORDER SETTING HEARING AND QUASH WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/24/2023: ORDER SETTING HEARING AND QUASH WRIT OF POSSESSION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingEvent: EVIDENTIARY HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR 01/30/2023 AT 3:00 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING AND QUASH WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ALONZO, EDMOND W - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CC003059, MCDOWELL, ROWMINNER VS. MORING, OCTAVIA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: ME-1/23/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR MOTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RECORDED (OTHER.4936.2321. / 5141442)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022000090214

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketFILING CLAIM > $2500 ASSESSED $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CC003059

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less