This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 22:59:43 (UTC).

MASSONI, DANIELLE vs. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 MASSONI, DANIELLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0232

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASSONI, DANIELLE

Defendant

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GILLENWATER, GRANT REILLY

COMBS, EDWARD CARNEL JR.

Defendant Attorneys

JURNOVOY, JOSHUA TOBIAS

RUFF, MARK HOWARD JR.

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

11/5/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

9/4/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL SETTLE ( V )

8/19/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL SETTLE ( V )

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ( V )

6/6/2019: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/4/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/5/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/4/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/4/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/4/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

9/2/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

8/19/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

COURT NOTES

8/7/2020: COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AMENDED

7/15/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION AMENDED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

5/29/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

5/8/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

5/6/2020: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE OF INTENT

4/29/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

4/28/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney JOSHUA TOBIAS JURNOVOY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney GRANT REILLY GILLENWATER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney MARK HOWARD RUFF JR. - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney EDWARD CARNEL COMBS JR. - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT - Recorded (Other.4471.752 / 4750194) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GILLENWATER, GRANT REILLY - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000232, MASSONI, DANIELLE VS. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/5/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GILLENWATER, GRANT REILLY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000010509 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 84354638 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190205235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/04/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000232

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUFF, MARK HOWARD JR.