This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 08/28/2020 at 08:04:35 (UTC).

MARRON, JE-MAY vs. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 MARRON, JE-MAY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0284

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARRON, JE-MAY

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DUNNAVANT, ERIN

KARTEN, LINDSAY CAPRI

Defendant Attorneys

GRETEL, KYLE ALAN

JONES, GREGORY DAVID

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

8/11/2020: RESPONSE

MOTION TO COMPEL

7/27/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND ADD PARTY

6/22/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND ADD PARTY

MOTION FOR LEAVE

6/4/2020: MOTION FOR LEAVE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

5/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

5/15/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/8/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

5/8/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

4/6/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

3/31/2020: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

MOTION TO DISMISS

3/31/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/27/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

3/27/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/13/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/13/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND ADD PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 07/02/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DUNNAVANT, ERIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000015035 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 103299223 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200214235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000284

    Read MoreRead Less