This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 12:31:26 (UTC).

MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC. vs. ELLIS, BRITTANY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC filed an Other lawsuit against ELLIS, BRITTANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0645

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC.

Defendant

ELLIS, BRITTANY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

3/22/2018: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

3/22/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

3/22/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

6/11/2018: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

6/14/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

7/13/2018: ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

7/13/2018: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

7/13/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

7/26/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

7/26/2018: AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

7/27/2018: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

8/13/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4168.2262 / 4469572) ( V )

8/14/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4168.2262 / 4469572) ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney WILLIAM MARK LINDEMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4168.2262 / 4469572) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/12/2018 AT 3:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2018000022484; Applied Amount; $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: LINDEMAN, WILLIAM MARK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CC000645, MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC. VS. ELLIS, BRITTANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-3/22/2018"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LINDEMAN, WILLIAM MARK ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/22/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CC000645

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018000022484 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 69673438 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20180322235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less