This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/20/2020 at 20:16:19 (UTC).

MACKELU, JEAN PIERRE vs. UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 MACKELU, JEAN PIERRE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1833

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACKELU, JEAN PIERRE

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL, JERROD

Defendant Attorney

LAUFER, CORY STUART

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4396.2115 / 4688221)

3/16/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4396.2115 / 4688221)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

3/16/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

12/11/2019: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( V )

11/1/2019: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/3/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/23/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/21/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAttorney JERROD PAUL - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAttorney CORY STUART LAUFER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4396.2115 / 4688221)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT B - JOINT STIP FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY - UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001833, MACKELU, JEAN PIERRE VS. UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOA-10/3/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: PAUL, JERROD - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001833, MACKELU, JEAN PIERRE VS. UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/23/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000078591; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PAUL, JERROD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/23/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001833

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000078591 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 96084052 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190923235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less