Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 02:41:22 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. NEWTON, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEWTON, CHARLES. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1390

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NEWTON, CHARLES

Fort Pierce, FL 34982-7583

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

HINES, MICHELLE K

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE - STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

4/9/2021: NOTICE - STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/9/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/9/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000029377; Applied Amount; $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HINES, MICHELLE K - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021SC001390, PLAINTIFF NOT ENTERED VS. DEFENDANT NOT ENTERED - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/9/2021,NTC-4/9/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/24/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: HINES, MICHELLE K ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC001390

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021000029377 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 124632525 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210409235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL