This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/19/2021 at 04:53:25 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. HERRICK, ROBYN

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERRICK, ROBYN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2149

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HERRICK, ROBYN

Port Saint Lucie, FL 34983-2811

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/16/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/16/2020: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

7/16/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/16/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

8/10/2020: ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

8/13/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COURT MINUTES

8/20/2020: COURT MINUTES

MOTION TO ADOPT STIPULATION AND DISMISS

8/26/2020: MOTION TO ADOPT STIPULATION AND DISMISS

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

9/8/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - Recorded (Other.4472.1064 / 4751016)

9/9/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - Recorded (Other.4472.1064 / 4751016)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

9/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAttorney MELISSA ANNE MURRAY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAttorney MICHELLE K HINES - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - Recorded (Other.4472.1064 / 4751016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ADOPT STIPULATION AND DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: MURRAY, MELISSA ANNE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/19/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: HINES, MICHELLE K ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: FISHMAN, BARRY ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SCHERR, HAROLD EARL ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/16/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020SC002149

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020000050038 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 110320178 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200716235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less