This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 01:13:01 (UTC).

LOESCH, ALLAN C vs. LOESCH, JOANNE S

Case Summary

On 01/02/2014 LOESCH, ALLAN C filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LOESCH, JOANNE S. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L, SCHWAB, CHARLES A, BAUER, SHERWOOD JR and SLUSHER, TERRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

SLUSHER, TERRY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOESCH, ALLAN C

Respondent

LOESCH, JOANNE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES

 

Court Documents

EMERGENCY MOTION ( V )

10/31/2019: EMERGENCY MOTION ( V )

ORDER DENYING ( V )

10/31/2019: ORDER DENYING ( V )

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA ( V )

11/6/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA ( V )

PETITION FOR MODIFICATION ( V )

11/7/2019: PETITION FOR MODIFICATION ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/12/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/20/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

MOTION ( V )

1/6/2020: MOTION ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

1/9/2020: ANSWER ( V )

CHLD SUPT GUIDELINES WK SHEET

1/2/2014: CHLD SUPT GUIDELINES WK SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDIRECT DEPOSIT INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDIRECT DEPOSIT INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 02/08/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2014DR000001, LOESCH, ALLAN C VS. LOESCH, JOANNE S - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFORDREFMAG-11/9/2021"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketS/O REFERRAL PARENT ED CLASS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketSTANDING TEMP DOMESTIC REL ODR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketPETITION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketPAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2014000000140

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ASSESSED $397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketDISSOLUTION JUDGMENT FEE ASSESSED $10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/02/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014DR000001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES