This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 05:01:24 (UTC).

LIVE YOUNG PLLC vs. PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 LIVE YOUNG PLLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1458

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIVE YOUNG PLLC

Defendant

PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTEAGA, DIANA

Defendant Attorney

FERRERA, MICHELLE L

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

6/24/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

6/14/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK

6/1/2022: AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK

ORDER INVOKING CIVIL RULE

6/1/2022: ORDER INVOKING CIVIL RULE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/1/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE SERVED

5/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

5/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION INVOKE RULES CIVIL PROCED.

5/26/2022: MOTION INVOKE RULES CIVIL PROCED.

STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE

5/26/2022: STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE

NOTICE-STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM/VIRTUAL APPEARANCE FOR PRE-TRIAL

5/9/2022: NOTICE-STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM/VIRTUAL APPEARANCE FOR PRE-TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/9/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

5/6/2022: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/6/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

5/6/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

5/6/2022: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/6/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT

5/6/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/6/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING 2019 PIP STATUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER EXPEDITED TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER INVOKING CIVIL RULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ARTEAGA, DIANA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022000036132 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 149125565 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220509235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC001458

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartfor is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ferrera, Michelle L