This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/19/2021 at 10:39:10 (UTC).

LEWIS, ASHLEY vs. KEPFER, YURY A

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 LEWIS, ASHLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEPFER, YURY A. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1633

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEWIS, MATTHEW

LEWIS, ASHLEY

Defendants

KEPFER, YURY A

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFERSON, BRADFORD L

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )

8/4/2021: NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )

SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

7/16/2021: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

7/15/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF MEDIATION - AMENDED AS TO DATE ONLY

6/8/2021: NOTICE OF MEDIATION - AMENDED AS TO DATE ONLY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

6/1/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/26/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

5/25/2021: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/7/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/17/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/3/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/28/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

1/14/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

12/30/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

12/10/2020: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

10/26/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/26/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/26/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/26/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAttorney BRADFORD L JEFFERSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4675.2039 / 4916394) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFERSON, BRADFORD L