This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 10:25:03 (UTC).

LEITI, KERI LYNN vs. LEITI, JASON JOHN

Case Summary

On 11/14/2013 LEITI, KERI LYNN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LEITI, JASON JOHN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and KLINGENSMITH, MARK WAYNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3174

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

KLINGENSMITH, MARK WAYNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEITI, KERI LYNN

Respondent

LEITI, JASON JOHN

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR DOMESTIC

11/14/2013: PETITION FOR DOMESTIC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/14/2013: CIVIL COVER SHEET

UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

11/14/2013: UCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

STEPS IN OBTAINING AN INJUNCTION

11/14/2013: STEPS IN OBTAINING AN INJUNCTION

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2013: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

11/27/2013: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

FINAL INJUNCTION-IN EFFECT UNTIL MAY 27, 2014 - Recorded (OR.3583.186 / 3902169)

11/27/2013: FINAL INJUNCTION-IN EFFECT UNTIL MAY 27, 2014 - Recorded (OR.3583.186 / 3902169)

JOINT STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER FOR TEMPORARY MODIFICATION OF EXISITING INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION - Recorded (OR.3599.1618 / 3919935)

1/29/2014: JOINT STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER FOR TEMPORARY MODIFICATION OF EXISITING INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION - Recorded (OR.3599.1618 / 3919935)

FINAL INJUNCTION DISMISSING INJUCTION - RECORDED (OR.3614.1715 / 3936514)

3/21/2014: FINAL INJUNCTION DISMISSING INJUCTION - RECORDED (OR.3614.1715 / 3936514)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney KIMMIE A CUNZO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL INJUNCTION DISMISSING INJUCTION - RECORDED (OR.3614.1715 / 3936514)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER FOR TEMPORARY MODIFICATION OF EXISITING INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION - Recorded (OR.3599.1618 / 3919935)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL INJUNCTION-IN EFFECT UNTIL MAY 27, 2014 - Recorded (OR.3583.186 / 3902169)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SUBPOENA DUCES TECEUM FOR HRG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2013
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET FOR 11/27/2013 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • DocketTEMP INJUNCTION NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTEPS IN OBTAINING AN INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR DOMESTIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • DocketWORKSHEET DV/RV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE KLINGENSMITH, MARK WAYNE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/14/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013DR003174

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less