This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 04:24:16 (UTC).

LASASSO, ANTHONY ALEXIS vs. BIRCHMEYER, HEIDI LYNN

Case Summary

On 02/17/2014 LASASSO, ANTHONY ALEXIS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BIRCHMEYER, HEIDI LYNN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L, BAUER, SHERWOOD JR and BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0419

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LASASSO, ANTHONY ALEXIS

Respondent

BIRCHMEYER, HEIDI LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STONE, ROBERT EUGENE

Respondent Attorney

GRAVES, ALICE JULIA

 

Court Documents

EMERGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF TIME SHARING ETC SENT EMAIL TO JUDGE BAUER AND ULA 6/30/17 SENT EMAIL TO NIKHOL, LATOYA, AND CAROL 6/30/17

6/30/2017: EMERGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF TIME SHARING ETC SENT EMAIL TO JUDGE BAUER AND ULA 6/30/17 SENT EMAIL TO NIKHOL, LATOYA, AND CAROL 6/30/17

FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY ( V )

5/12/2016: FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY ( V )

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

4/2/2015: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

PARENTING PLAN

1/30/2015: PARENTING PLAN

NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

8/1/2017: NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

RETURN MAIL

5/14/2015: RETURN MAIL

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

1/26/2015: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

7/5/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

6/19/2014: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR; Location: Courtroom 4A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: GRAVES, ALICE JULIA ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 01/08/2018 AT 1:30 PM IN 4A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketS/O REFERRAL PARENT ED CLASS E-MAILED ATTY 2-17-14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED E-MAILED ATTY 2-17-14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketPETITION PAT, CHILD SUPP & OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ARONOFF, DEREK MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/17/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014DR000419

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketPAYMENT $313.00 RECEIPT #2014000017592 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 10346401 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20140217235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE, ROBERT EUGENE